Global patent index - EP 0896310 A3

EP 0896310 A3 2000-07-05 - Combined paging and light signalling device

Title (en)

Combined paging and light signalling device

Title (de)

Kombination von Personensuch- und Lichtrufanlage

Title (fr)

Combinaison d'un système d'appel et d'un dispositif de signalisation lumineuse

Publication

EP 0896310 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114753 A

Priority

  • DE 19734404 A
  • DE 19737847 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896310A2] The installation transmits a call signal from a terminal to a central unit. The call signal is transferred to a personnel paging device (14) which transmits wirelessly to one or more receiver units (15). The central unit (12) includes a switch-in module (20) which is configured so that confirmation information returned from a receiver unit (15) back to the central unit can also be transferred back to the terminal (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 3/10; G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 5/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896310 A2 19990210; EP 0896310 A3 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010106

2001-04-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 3/10 A, 7G 08B 25/01 B

1999-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DETEWE - DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI