Global Patent Index - EP 0896387 B1

EP 0896387 B1 2000-12-27 - Screw clamp and terminal block for an electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Screw clamp and terminal block for an electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Schraubklemme und Anschlussleiste für einen elektrischen Apparat

Title (fr)

Borne à vis et bornier pour appareil électrique.

Publication

EP 0896387 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401774 A

Priority

FR 9710251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896387A1] Two grip sections (41) are enclosed in one unit (35) securely gripping two (34) wires. The contact piece (41) is U-shaped. The upper U-section is screw held (34). The bar insert provides simple connection to the electrical apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/36; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/363 (2013.01); H01R 4/2408 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896387 A1 19990210; EP 0896387 B1 20001227; DE 69800453 D1 20010201; DE 69800453 T2 20010419; FR 2767228 A1 19990212; FR 2767228 B1 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800453

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090704

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800453 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-12-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI