Global Patent Index - EP 0896400 A3

EP 0896400 A3 2000-02-23 - Connecting device for bus participants

Title (en)

Connecting device for bus participants

Title (de)

Anschlusseinrichtung für Busteilnehmer

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison pour des utilisateurs de bus

Publication

EP 0896400 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111401 A

Priority

DE 19734106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896400A2] The arrangement (1) is in the form of a plug socket strip in a housing (17) and a connector cable (3) with a plug (4) for connecting the connector to the low voltage network. A bus coupling and a driver stage are built into the housing, whereby the circuit formed by the loads connected to the sockets can be remotely switched via the bus system, or additional programming can be conducted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/00; H01R 13/629; H01R 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/00 (2006.01); H01R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/003 (2013.01); H01R 29/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896400 A2 19990210; EP 0896400 A3 20000223; DE 19734106 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 25/00 A, 7H 01R 29/00 B, 7H 01R 13/629 B

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI