Global Patent Index - EP 0896506 A4

EP 0896506 A4 2003-06-18 - METHODS FOR INDUCING IMMUNE RESPONSIVENESS IN A SUBJECT

Title (en)

METHODS FOR INDUCING IMMUNE RESPONSIVENESS IN A SUBJECT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM INDUZIEREN DER MÖGLICHKEIT EINER IMMUNANTWORT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DESTINE A INDUIRE CHEZ UN SUJET UNE APTITUDE A LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE

Publication

EP 0896506 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97916046 A

Priority

  • US 9704285 W
  • US 62110996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734472A1] The present invention provides improved methods for extracorporeal blood treatment, such as photochemotherapy, and related compositions are provided. The improved method involves introducing dendritic cells into the extracorporeal blood stream during agent treatment to further enhance the subject's immune system response to antigens present in the peripheral blood. The present invention further provides methods of identifying agents for use in the extracorporeal treatment of blood based on the ability of the agent to increase MHC expression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 1/02; A01N 43/16; A01N 63/00; A61K 35/14; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/19; A61K 38/20; A61K 38/21; C07K 1/14; C07K 1/30; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/14 (2013.01); A61K 35/15 (2013.01); A61K 38/1825 (2013.01); A61K 38/191 (2013.01); A61K 38/193 (2013.01); A61K 38/2026 (2013.01); A61K 38/208 (2013.01); A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); A61K 41/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5152 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5154 (2013.01); A61K 2039/605 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 35/15 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 35/14 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 38/2026 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 38/208 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 38/191 + A61K 2300/00
  6. A61K 38/193 + A61K 2300/00
  7. A61K 38/1825 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9534638 A1 19951221 - UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]
  • [Y] EP 0333606 B1 19940608 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL]
  • [YD] WO 9411016 A1 19940526 - UNIV YALE [US], et al
  • [YD] WO 9320185 A1 19931014 - STEINMAN RALPH M [US], et al
  • [X] HSU F J ET AL: "VACCINATION OF PATIENTS WITH B-CELL LYMPHOMA USING AUTOLOGOUS ANTIGEN-PULSED DENTRITIC CELLS", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, vol. 2, no. 1, 1996, pages 52 - 58, XP000605401, ISSN: 1078-8956
  • [YD] STORKUS W J ET AL: "Identification of T-cell epitopes: rapid isolation of class I-presented peptides from viable cells by mild acid elution.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTHERAPY: OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR BIOLOGICAL THERAPY. UNITED STATES AUG 1993, vol. 14, no. 2, August 1993 (1993-08-01), pages 94 - 103, XP009009060, ISSN: 1053-8550
  • [T] BERGER CAROLE L ET AL: "Transimmunization, a novel approach for tumor immunotherapy.", TRANSFUSION AND APHERESIS SCIENCE, vol. 26, no. 3, June 2002 (2002-06-01), June, 2002, pages 205 - 216, XP002238289, ISSN: 1473-0502
  • See also references of WO 9734472A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734472 A1 19970925; AU 2331597 A 19971010; CA 2249412 A1 19970925; EP 0896506 A1 19990217; EP 0896506 A4 20030618; JP 2000508628 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-06-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE