Global Patent Index - EP 0896637 B1

EP 0896637 B1 2000-05-24 - USE OF ALUMINIUM-SILICON-MAGNESIUM ALLOY FOR MANUFACTURING OF MOTOR VEHICLE BODY PARTS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME.

Title (en)

USE OF ALUMINIUM-SILICON-MAGNESIUM ALLOY FOR MANUFACTURING OF MOTOR VEHICLE BODY PARTS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME.

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER ALUMINIUM-SILIZIUM-MAGNESIUM-LEGIERUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FAHRZEUGKARROSSERIETEILEN UND VERFAHREN DIESER HERSTELLUNG.

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-SILICIUM-MAGNESIUM POUR FABRICATION DE PIECES DE CARROSSERIE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TELLES PIECES.

Publication

EP 0896637 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97921897 A

Priority

  • FR 9700755 W
  • FR 9605595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741272A1] The invention discloses an aluminium alloy, to be used particularly in the manufacture of the external parts of a motor vehicle body, of the following composition (wt.%): Si: 0.5-0.8, Mg 0.45-0.65, Cu: 0.55-0.75, Mn and/or Cr: 0.1-0.3 with 1.6 < Si + Mg + Cu < 2.0. The composition of the invention provides high mechanical strength following an easy solution-treatment step and paint curing at 150 to 170 DEG C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/16; B62D 29/00; C22C 21/02; C22F 1/043; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/14 (2006.01); C22C 21/16 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 21/14 (2013.01); C22C 21/16 (2013.01); C22F 1/057 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741272 A1 19971106; DE 69702133 D1 20000629; DE 69702133 T2 20001109; DE 69702133 T3 20060420; EP 0896637 A1 19990217; EP 0896637 B1 20000524; EP 0896637 B2 20050727; ES 2146467 T3 20000801; ES 2146467 T5 20060301; FR 2748035 A1 19971031; FR 2748035 B1 19980703

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAWASAKI STEEL CORP., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAISER ALUMINIUM & CHEMICAL CORP., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAWASAKI STEEL CORP., KOBE, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAISER ALUMINIUM & CHEMICAL CORP., PLEASANTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100429

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PECHINEY RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2005-11-09 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2005-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2005-07-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2005-04-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PK

- Free Format Text: LE TITRE DE L'INVENTION A ETE CHANGE PAR L'OEB:

2005-04-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-04-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7C 22C 21/16 A

2005-04-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7C 22C 21/02 B

2005-04-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7C 22F 1/057 B

2005-04-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7C 22F 1/043 B

2005-04-27 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 62D 29/00 B

2005-04-27 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: USE OF ALUMINIUM-SILICON-MAGNESIUM ALLOY FOR MANUFACTURING OF MOTOR VEHICLE BODY PARTS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE S

2003-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PECHINEY RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KAISER ALUMINIUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146467

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PECHINEY RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAISER ALUMINIUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980914

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI