Global Patent Index - EP 0896668 A4

EP 0896668 A4 2000-03-15 - SOLID-STATE GAS SENSOR

Title (en)

SOLID-STATE GAS SENSOR

Title (de)

FESTKÖRPERGASSENSOR

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE GAZ A L'ETAT SOLIDE

Publication

EP 0896668 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97923463 A

Priority

  • US 9706981 W
  • US 64045196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741428A1] A solid-state sensor (50) provides for sensitive detection of a selected gas in a gaseous mixture to output a signal useful for monitoring and control. The sensor has a solid-state oxide electrolyte (54), a first electrode (52) contacting the electrolyte for oxidizing or reducing the selected gas in the gaseous mixture at a first reaction rate, and a second electrode (56) contacting the electrolyte for reducing oxygen in the gaseous mixture at a second reaction rate. The difference in the first and second rates produces a measurable electrochemical potential across the electrolyte. The improvement in the sensor comprises the first electrode formed from a dense thin film of a mixed conductor suitable for catalyzing the oxidation or reduction of the selected gas. Suitable mixed conductor films are formed from perovskite-type and fluorite-type oxides with a thickness less than about 1 um.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/407

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/407 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/4074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741428 A1 19971106; AU 2926197 A 19971119; BR 9709755 A 19990810; CA 2262755 A1 19971106; EP 0896668 A1 19990217; EP 0896668 A4 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

2000-03-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE