Global Patent Index - EP 0896837 A3

EP 0896837 A3 2000-08-02 - Arrangement for sorting garbage

Title (en)

Arrangement for sorting garbage

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Abfall

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour trier des déchets

Publication

EP 0896837 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98202696 A

Priority

  • NL 1006768 A
  • NL 1007235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896837A2] The invention relates to a cylindrical sieve (1), for separating garbage (3) in two or three components. The holes (4) in the cylindrical sieve (1) are covered in order to prevent long, slender objects from protruding from the cylindrical sieve (1) and get stuck. Covers are arranged as individual plates (6), as axial segments, as radial segments, as an additional cylindrical sieve or as an additional transport belt covering the underside of cylindrical sieve (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/18 (2006.01); B07B 1/22 (2006.01); B07B 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/18 (2013.01); B07B 1/22 (2013.01); B07B 1/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 5373948 A 19941220 - NAGAKI TSUNORU [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896837 A2 19990217; EP 0896837 A3 20000802; EP 0896837 B1 20041020; AT 279993 T 20041115; DE 69827087 D1 20041125; DE 69827087 T2 20051020

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827087 P 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUSSCHERS, ALFONSIUS JOHANNES MARIA DECEASED

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990730

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI