Global Patent Index - EP 0896840 A4

EP 0896840 A4 2001-04-04 - ROLLING MILL AND ROLLING METHOD AND ROLLING EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

ROLLING MILL AND ROLLING METHOD AND ROLLING EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

WALZWERK, WALZVERFAHREN UND WALZANALGE

Title (fr)

LAMINOIR, ET PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT DE LAMINAGE

Publication

EP 0896840 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96908338 A

Priority

JP 9600918 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736700A1] At least the working rolls in two groups of rolls are held by unitary metal chocks. The driving side portion and operating side portion of a material to be rolled are held at the upper side thereof by separately formed unitary metal chocks, and at the lower side thereof as well by similar unitary metal chocks. Two groups of rolls can be arranged close to each other, and the meandering and a bend of a material to be rolled are prevented. A rolling mill and a rolling method and rolling equipment which are easy to maintain and provide a high rolling efficiency can be provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/14; B21B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/26 (2006.01); B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/34 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 27/10 (2006.01); B21B 28/04 (2006.01); B21B 38/06 (2006.01); B21B 39/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2013.01); B21B 1/26 (2013.01); B21B 31/02 (2013.01); B21B 1/34 (2013.01); B21B 1/46 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01); B21B 13/023 (2013.01); B21B 27/10 (2013.01); B21B 28/04 (2013.01); B21B 38/06 (2013.01); B21B 39/16 (2013.01); B21B 2013/021 (2013.01); B21B 2013/025 (2013.01); B21B 2013/028 (2013.01); B21B 2269/16 (2013.01); B21B 2273/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9736700A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736700 A1 19971009; DE 69623343 D1 20021002; DE 69623343 T2 20030424; EP 0896840 A1 19990217; EP 0896840 A4 20010404; EP 0896840 B1 20020828

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060403

2005-06-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69623343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981026

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB