Global Patent Index - EP 0896861 A3

EP 0896861 A3 2000-11-15 - Combined cutting and grinding tool

Title (en)

Combined cutting and grinding tool

Title (de)

Kombiniertes Trenn- und Schleifwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil combiné de meulage et de tronçonnage

Publication

EP 0896861 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660074 A

Priority

FI 973293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896861A2] The invention relates to an arrangement in connection with a tool, to be used for instance in an angle grinder. The arrangement comprises a spindle (2) rotated by a drive unit, a standard wheel (1) being arranged to the spindle by means of a spindle nut (4). To the spindle (2) is also arranged a separate grinding member smaller than the standard wheel (1), the grinding member having a grinding surface on its outer periphery. The arrangement can be used for instance in plumbing: the standard wheel (1) can be used for cutting the pipes and the grinding member for grinding the flash from the cutting point. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 5/12; B24D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B24D 5/12 (2006.01); B24D 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2013.01); B24D 5/12 (2013.01); B24D 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896861 A2 19990217; EP 0896861 A3 20001115; FI 973293 A0 19970811; FI 973293 A 19990212

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI