Global Patent Index - EP 0896877 B1

EP 0896877 B1 2001-12-05 - Chambered doctor blade assembly for an inking device of a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Chambered doctor blade assembly for an inking device of a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Rakelvorrichtung für ein Spülfarbwerk einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de racle à chambre pour l'encrier d'une presse à imprimer rotative

Publication

EP 0896877 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113049 A

Priority

DE 19734910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896877A2] The doctor device consists of a doctor knife carrier (1) with ink gutter (2), to which two doctor knives (12) are attached. A closed ink chamber is formed by them with the ink roller, the doctor knife carrier and sealing pieces (7) of elastomer material. There are also lines to supply ink to the chamber and to drain ink from it. The sealing pieces are held in their seats (6) by quick-release locks (14) formed from turning bars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01); B41F 9/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896877 A2 19990217; EP 0896877 A3 19990707; EP 0896877 B1 20011205; BR 9803139 A 19991005; CN 1116173 C 20030730; CN 1207983 A 19990217; CZ 293004 B6 20040114; CZ 9802493 A3 19990317; DE 19734910 A1 19990218; ES 2169463 T3 20020701; JP H11123813 A 19990511; TW 414759 B 20001211; US 6035781 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802301

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120714

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120714

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110713

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169463 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802301 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CHAMBERED DOCTOR BLADE ASSEMBLY FOR AN INKING DEVICE OF A ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI