Global Patent Index - EP 0896934 B1

EP 0896934 B1 2002-11-20 - Container bag from a fabric and/or foil material

Title (en)

Container bag from a fabric and/or foil material

Title (de)

Transportsack aus Gewebe- und/oder Folienmaterial

Title (fr)

Conteneur flexible en tissu et/ou d'un materiau en feuille

Publication

EP 0896934 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113843 A

Priority

AT 135997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896934A1] The sack, for the transport of loose materials, is of a woven and/or film material in two outer layers and an intermediate layer. The two outer layers (1,2) are bonded together by one or more connectors (5) passing through the intermediate layer (3). The outer layers are conductive, such as in a woven material of low pressure polyethylene or polypropylene. The conductivity is through woven metal filaments or a metal coating, or weaving in carbonised polyolefin filaments. The centre layer is of extruded polypropylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896934 A1 19990217; EP 0896934 B1 20021120; AT 228091 T 20021215; DE 59806326 D1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806326 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228091 T 20021215

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

1999-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB NL

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990805

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI