Global patent index - EP 0896937 B1

EP 0896937 B1 2001-04-11 - Apparatus for placing a stack of sheets on a stack feeding device

Title (en)

Apparatus for placing a stack of sheets on a stack feeding device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen eines Stapels aus Bogen auf einen Rundstapelanleger

Title (fr)

Appareil pour disposer une pile de feuilles sur un dispositif d'alimentation en piles

Publication

EP 0896937 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114922 A

Priority

DE 19735115 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735115C1] The device delivers a sheet stack (1) to a table from which the individual sheets are fed via a separation device, using a transport carriage (4) for delivering the sheet-stack to a delivery point (7). The transport carriage has a stop rail on the opposite side to the stack insertion side and a perpendicular stop rail on the opposite side to the stack delivery point. The drive for movement of the carriage from the stack reception point (5) to the delivery point is controlled by a first signal and halted by a sensor detecting the position of the last sheet in the staggered stack on the table.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/30; B65H 5/24; B65H 29/34; B65H 29/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/22 (2006.01); B65H 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 1/22 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735115 C1 19981022; EP 0896937 A2 19990217; EP 0896937 A3 19990512; EP 0896937 B1 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050807

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991029

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI