Global Patent Index - EP 0896941 B1

EP 0896941 B1 2001-12-12 - Winding apparatus

Title (en)

Winding apparatus

Title (de)

Wickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage

Publication

EP 0896941 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113308 A

Priority

DE 19734829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896941A1] A paper winding machine (1) takes up a continual supply of paper web material (2) on a core spindle (3) to create a roll (4). The roll core spindle (3) has a holder and a central roller (5). During the initial take-up of the material (2) to the core spindle (3) a pressure roller (8) is applied to the roll (4). The pressure roller (8) consists of a web tension compensation roller (9) and a counter-pressure roller (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26; B65H 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414863 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896941 A1 19990217; EP 0896941 B1 20011212; DE 19734829 A1 19990225; DE 19734829 C2 20020131; US 6012673 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090716

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060717

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802409 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001110

1999-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981127

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI