Global Patent Index - EP 0896942 B1

EP 0896942 B1 2001-05-23 - Device for dividing signature streams behind a folding apparatus

Title (en)

Device for dividing signature streams behind a folding apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufteilung von Exemplarströmen hinter einem Falzapparat

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour diviser des courants d'exemplaires derrière un appareil de pliage

Publication

EP 0896942 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112325 A

Priority

US 91431397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896942A2] A continual supply of printed e.g. magazines emerges from a folding machine and is subdivided by a machine with two rotating wheel drive units (9,10). The wheels drive cables (3,4), each of which has grip-blocks (1,2) and grip elements (5,6) which lift single copies of the magazine from the emerging flow. The cables run in parallel to the first wheel, where one cable then runs around the first wheel. The other cable then continues to the second wheel over which it is then returned, rejoining the first wheel with the first cable. Each of the grip blocks has a recess (17,18) through which one of the cables passes, and a second recess (15,16) through which the other cable passes without making contact with the block. The size of the recess in the grip-blocks is such that during one section of their travel, the grip-blocks secured to the first cable advance in unison with those on the second cable, and follow a different route when the cables separate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/60; B65H 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/005 (2013.01); B65H 2301/33 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4451 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44552 (2013.01); B65H 2405/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896942 A2 19990217; EP 0896942 A3 19991020; EP 0896942 B1 20010523; DE 59800749 D1 20010628; US 6062372 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800749

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020719

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800749 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000222

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65H 29/60 A, 6B 65H 29/00 B

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI