Global Patent Index - EP 0896943 B1

EP 0896943 B1 2001-12-05 - Method and device for continuous regulation of a printable material in a printing system

Title (en)

Method and device for continuous regulation of a printable material in a printing system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur stufenlosen Regulierung eines bedruckbaren Materials in einem Drucksystem

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la régulation continue d'un matériau imprimable dans un système d'impression

Publication

EP 0896943 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112877 A

Priority

US 91011897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896943A2] A machine provides infinitely-variable regulation of the speed of passage of a continual supply of printed paper products. The machine consists of two upright frames, one longer than the other, each with a rectangular arrangement of four hubs left and right of each frame. The frames are placed back to back with the hubs in downwards contra-rotation, feeding the paper product through the centre.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/06; B65H 29/04; B65H 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/044 (2013.01); B65H 29/06 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0448 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2183 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2192 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2194 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4734 (2015.04); Y10T 83/483 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6542 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896943 A2 19990217; EP 0896943 A3 19990512; EP 0896943 B1 20011205; DE 59802303 D1 20020117; US 6067883 A 20000530; US 6918586 B1 20050719

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802303

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020719

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020624

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802303 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980710

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI