Global patent index - EP 0897045 A3

EP 0897045 A3 2000-11-15 - Unhingeable door hinge combined with a door check

Title (en)

Unhingeable door hinge combined with a door check

Title (de)

Mit einem aushängbaren Türscharnier baulich vereinigter Türfeststeller

Title (fr)

Charnière de porte décrochable à arrêt de porte intégré

Publication

EP 0897045 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115070 A

Priority

DE 19734842 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897045A2] A hinge pin (5) with a running seat is located in the one hinge half (1) and is non-rotatably accommodated in the other hinge half (2). The hinge pin in the first hinge half is rotatably located by a bearing bush (4) of maintenance free material. The door lock amalgamated with the hinge comprises a holding device (11) with a securing disc. The door lock also comprises brake and holding bodies (12) located in a brake body carrier (13) and a spring (14) loading the brake and holding bodies. A housing is provided for the brake and lock installation. The holding device is formed by a pressure ring (16) concentric to the hinge pin (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/08 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/1085 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54021 (2013.01); Y10T 16/540255 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 29614379 U1 19961024 - SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897045 A2 19990217; EP 0897045 A3 20001115; EP 0897045 B1 20030409; AR 016610 A1 20010725; BR 9816116 A 20010814; CN 1077950 C 20020116; CN 1208115 A 19990217; DE 19734842 A1 19990218; JP H11107611 A 19990420; MX PA98006520 A 20050915; US 6073309 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807811

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59807811

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-03-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980811

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI