Global Patent Index - EP 0897084 A3

EP 0897084 A3 2001-01-24 - Building component with light-holder

Title (en)

Building component with light-holder

Title (de)

Bauelement mit Deckelelement

Title (fr)

Elément de construction avec support de lampe

Publication

EP 0897084 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114666 A

Priority

DE 19735013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735013C1] The component has a light source holder (4) for installation in or on a wall (8) or building supporting element. The component has a recess (10) for the light source holder and an indirect illumination partial covering element (12) for the recess. The light source is fully covered and the uncovered portion of the recess is bounded by an inner wall (14) opposite the light source holder, whereby the cover element bounds onto the outside of the component. The cover element has a through channel (30) which is covered at its rear opening by a removable cover element (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735013 C1 19981105; EP 0897084 A2 19990217; EP 0897084 A3 20010124

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-12-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI