Global Patent Index - EP 0897086 A3

EP 0897086 A3 2001-03-14 - Method for determining the average radiation of a burner bed in an incinerating plant and for the control of the combustion process

Title (en)

Method for determining the average radiation of a burner bed in an incinerating plant and for the control of the combustion process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ermitteln der durchschnittlichen Strahlung eines Brennbettes in Verbrennungsanlagen und Regelung des Verbrennungsvorganges

Title (fr)

Procédé de détermination du rayonnement moyen d'un lit de combustion dans un système d'incinération et la commande du processus de la combustion

Publication

EP 0897086 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112509 A

Priority

DE 19735139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897086A2] The radiation measuring method uses an IR camera (22), or a thermography camera, for viewing the flat region of the combustion bed (24), with the measurement limited to a defined wavelength range in which the effect of the combustion gases above the combustion bed is a minimum and analysis of successive images for each partial area of this region, for determining the corresponding temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/08; F23G 5/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/02 (2006.01); F23G 5/50 (2006.01); F23M 11/04 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/082 (2013.01); F23G 5/50 (2013.01); F23G 2207/1015 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55009 (2013.01); F23N 2029/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5139412 A 19920818 - KYCHAKOFF GEORGE [US], et al
  • [A] US 4539588 A 19850903 - ARIESSOHN PETER C [US], et al
  • [AD] DE 4220149 A1 19931223 - STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]
  • [A] US 4737844 A 19880412 - KOHOLA PEKKA [FI], et al
  • [A] BUSCH M ET AL: "ENTWICKLUNG EINER KAMERAGEFUEHRTEN FEUERUNGSREGELUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES VERBRENNUNGS-, AUSBRAND- UND EMISSIONSVERHALTENS EINER ABFALL-VERBRENNUNGSANLAGE", VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK,DE,VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH. ESSEN, vol. 73, no. 7, 1 July 1993 (1993-07-01), pages 614 - 618, XP000383296, ISSN: 0372-5715
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 227 (M - 1597) 25 April 1994 (1994-04-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897086 A2 19990217; EP 0897086 A3 20010314; EP 0897086 B1 20020605; AT 218688 T 20020615; BR 9803742 A 19991109; BR 9803742 B1 20120110; CA 2244704 C 19991130; CZ 291661 B6 20030416; CZ 9802514 A3 19990317; DE 19735139 C1 19990225; DK 0897086 T3 20020930; ES 2176860 T3 20021201; JP 3111177 B2 20001120; JP H11118146 A 19990430; NO 313215 B1 20020826; NO 983679 A 19990215; NO 983679 D0 19980811; PL 327965 A1 19990215; PT 897086 E 20021129; RU 2144645 C1 20000120; SG 63854 A1 19990330; TW 357247 B 19990501; US 5890444 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176860 T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804291 20020711

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218688 T 20020615

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23N 5/08 A, 7F 23G 5/50 B

1999-05-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1999-04-21 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI