Global Patent Index - EP 0897091 A3

EP 0897091 A3 2000-12-13 - Device for mounting a covering element

Title (en)

Device for mounting a covering element

Title (de)

Befestigungseinrichtung für einen Verkleidungsabschnitt

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour un panneau de revêtement

Publication

EP 0897091 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114824 A

Priority

DE 19734795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897091A2] The fixing device is for a heating body which has two vertical collection lines (14) and several horizontal heating tubes (16) between them. The fixing device (18, 20) includes a holding sector (18) for fitting to the heating body and a fixing sector (20) to fix the diaphragm (10) or cladding sector. The fixing sector has at least one engaging sector which fits in a corresponding recess in the diaphragm or cladding sector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897091 A2 19990217; EP 0897091 A3 20001213; CZ 9802389 A3 19990217; DE 19734795 A1 19990218; PL 327887 A1 19990215

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI