Global patent index - EP 0897097 A3

EP 0897097 A3 2000-09-06 - Sandwich plate for protection from explosive mines

Title (en)

Sandwich plate for protection from explosive mines

Title (de)

Sandwichplatte zum Schutz gegen explosive Minen

Title (fr)

Plaque composite pour la protection contre les mines terrestres

Publication

EP 0897097 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114601 A

Priority

DE 19734950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897097A2] The sandwich protective plate material has thin metal plates, using a very hard metal with high expansion. The leading hard foam layer (3), towards the effects of a blast, has a bulk density of at least 100 kg/m<3>. A dynamic and pressure-resistant plate (11) is of plastics. The structured components (6) are of a relatively light and stiff material, resistant to bending, with a high plastic take-up, using a metal and/or a plastics and especially an elastomer with carbon or glass fibre reinforcement. The thin limit layers (7,8) are of multi-angle or otherwise shaped and/or corrugated intermediate layers (9) or intermediate bodies which are bonded to give open passage channels (12) or spaces between the limit layers (7,8), or flat part-spaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/04 (2006.01); F41H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/042 (2013.01); F41H 5/0457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897097 A2 19990217; EP 0897097 A3 20000906; EP 0897097 B1 20040526; AT 267998 T 20040615; DE 19734950 A1 19990225; DE 19734950 C2 19990527; ES 2221100 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-05-06 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 04/48 PAGES: 275 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA PUBLICATION ERRONEE DE LA REMISE DE CETTE TRADUCTION. LA TRADUCTION CORRECTE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221100

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KELLNER, GERD

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI