Global Patent Index - EP 0897168 A3

EP 0897168 A3 2000-05-24 - Method for providing warning indications for the driver of a vehicle and traffic warning device

Title (en)

Method for providing warning indications for the driver of a vehicle and traffic warning device

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erstellung von Warnhinweisen für Fahrer eines Kraftfahrzeugs und Verkehrswarngerät

Title (fr)

Procédé d'élaboration d'indications d'avertissement pour le conducteur d'un véhicule et apparail d'avertissement pour la circulation

Publication

EP 0897168 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111704 A

Priority

DE 19730791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897168A2] The method involves using sensor data from a motor vehicle. whereby warning indications are produced in the vehicle itself by evaluating the on-board sensor data which is transmitted from vehicle to vehicle. The warning indication is produced after evaluating the sensor data produced in other vehicles. An evaluation unit (5) is connected to numerous sensors (1) in the motor vehicle. A receiver (10) receives data transmitted from other vehicles, and a transmitter (10) transmits the vehicle's own data to other vehicles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0962

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 5/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/162 (2013.01); G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01); G08G 1/096791 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730791 A1 19990121; EP 0897168 A2 19990217; EP 0897168 A3 20000524; EP 0897168 B1 20041201; JP H1170836 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-09 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59812318

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812318 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020905

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI