Global Patent Index - EP 0897202 A3

EP 0897202 A3 2001-04-18 - Connector for coaxial cable

Title (en)

Connector for coaxial cable

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Koaxialkabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble coaxial

Publication

EP 0897202 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111260 A

Priority

DE 19729876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897202A2] The connector has a plug head (1) aperture with two annular surfaces (4,6), at least one of which has at least one annular bead (30) protruding in the direction of the corresp. surface of the end region (12a) of the cable's outer conductor (12), and whose height is about 5 to 30 per cent of the wall thickness of the outer conductor

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 24/564 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729876 A1 19990211; DE 19729876 C2 19991111; BR 9802415 A 19990921; BR 9802415 B1 20100727; CN 1117418 C 20030806; CN 1205564 A 19990120; EP 0897202 A2 19990217; EP 0897202 A3 20010418; EP 0897202 B1 20021120; US 5993254 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-01-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160618

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806327

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806327

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2006-03-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806327 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2002-03-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR IT LI SE

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FI FR IT LI SE

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI