Global patent index - EP 0897215 A3

EP 0897215 A3 2000-08-09 - Surface acoustic wave device

Title (en)

Surface acoustic wave device

Title (de)

Akustische Oberflächenwellenanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à ondes acoustiques de surface

Publication

EP 0897215 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98402035 A

Priority

JP 21649497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897215A2] A surface acoustic wave device substantially eliminates a stress caused by a curing shrinkage of an adhesive (8) and substantially eliminates a strain in a case (2) containing a surface acoustic wave element (3) to prevent variation in characteristics of the surface acoustic wave device. In addition, a strength of joining of bonding wires (14, 15) provided in the surface acoustic wave device is improved to have an improved reliability. The surface acoustic wave element (3) of the surface acoustic wave device is fixed on a case member (4) via a soft adhesive (8) and bonding electrodes (9a, 9b) of the surface acoustic wave element have a plurality of through holes (11). Ends of the bonding wires (14, 15) are wire-bonded to the bonding electrodes (9a, 9b) having the through holes (11) formed therein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 9/02; H03H 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/60 (2006.01); H01L 21/52 (2006.01); H03H 9/02 (2006.01); H03H 9/145 (2006.01); H03H 9/25 (2006.01); H03H 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/02992 (2013.01); H01L 24/05 (2013.01); H01L 24/06 (2013.01); H01L 24/48 (2013.01); H03H 9/02984 (2013.01); H01L 24/45 (2013.01); H01L 24/73 (2013.01); H01L 2224/04042 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05556 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05599 (2013.01); H01L 2224/2919 (2013.01); H01L 2224/32225 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45124 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45144 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45147 (2013.01); H01L 2224/4807 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48227 (2013.01); H01L 2224/4845 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48465 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48599 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48699 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48799 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73265 (2013.01); H01L 2224/92247 (2013.01); H01L 2924/00014 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01004 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01024 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01029 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01078 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01082 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12041 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15153 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15165 (2013.01); H01L 2924/16195 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/45124 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2224/45144 + H01L 2924/00014
  3. H01L 2224/45147 + H01L 2924/00014
  4. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  5. H01L 2224/2919 + H01L 2924/0665
  6. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48227
  7. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/05599
  8. H01L 2224/73265 + H01L 2224/32225 + H01L 2224/48227 + H01L 2924/00012
  9. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48227 + H01L 2924/00012
  10. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00012
  11. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48227 + H01L 2924/00
  12. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00
  13. H01L 2224/48799 + H01L 2924/00
  14. H01L 2224/92247 + H01L 2224/73265 + H01L 2224/32225 + H01L 2224/48227 + H01L 2924/00
  15. H01L 2924/12041 + H01L 2924/00
  16. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/05556
  17. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/85399

Citation (search report)

  • [PA] US 5686762 A 19971111 - LANGLEY RODNEY C [US]
  • [Y] HIROMI YATSUDA ET AL: "MINIATURIZED SAW FILTERS USING A FLIP-CHIP TECHNIQUE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL,US,IEEE INC. NEW.YORK, vol. 43, no. 1, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), pages 125 - 129, XP000557496, ISSN: 0885-3010
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 168 (E - 411) 14 June 1986 (1986-06-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 423 (E - 680) 9 November 1988 (1988-11-09)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 252 (E - 1547) 13 May 1994 (1994-05-13)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897215 A2 19990217; EP 0897215 A3 20000809; CN 1144359 C 20040331; CN 1216415 A 19990512; JP H1168504 A 19990309; US 6087756 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040722

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 03H 9/02 A, 7H 03H 9/13 B

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI