Global Patent Index - EP 0897372 B1

EP 0897372 B1 2000-01-05 - CONTAINING STRUCTURE FOR LIFT MACHINERY

Title (en)

CONTAINING STRUCTURE FOR LIFT MACHINERY

Title (de)

GEHÄUSESTRUKTUR FÜR AUFZUGSANTRIEB

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE CREUSE POUR MACHINERIE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 0897372 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97917379 A

Priority

  • IB 9700485 W
  • IT MI960937 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742119A1] Containing structure (10) for a lift machinery, the structure being made of metal or other suitable material, consisting of a housing (18) in which at least one of the constituent walls is defined by leaves hinged to a permanent wall (14) of the building or to another wall of the housing (18). The object of the present invention is to provide a containing room or structure for lift machinery, occupying very little space and at the same time providing enough space for maintenance work. A permanent fixed room within the building for the lift machinery is not required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/001 (2013.01); B66B 11/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742119 A1 19971113; AT 188448 T 20000115; AU 2574597 A 19971126; AU 721225 B2 20000629; BR 9708941 A 20000104; CA 2253210 A1 19971113; CN 1218441 A 19990602; CZ 9803590 A3 19990414; DE 69701093 D1 20000210; DE 69701093 T2 20000914; EP 0897372 A1 19990224; EP 0897372 B1 20000105; ES 2143857 T3 20000516; HK 1018610 A1 20000714; HU 9901963 A2 19991028; HU 9901963 A3 20000428; IT 1282980 B1 19980403; IT MI960937 A1 19971110; IT MI960937 D0 19960509; JP 2000509689 A 20000802; KR 20000010839 A 20000225; NO 985188 A 19981106; NO 985188 D0 19981106; PL 329835 A1 19990412; PT 897372 E 20000630; TR 9802117 T2 20010723

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050505

2003-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-03-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INVENTIO A.G.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GMV MARTINI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-06-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010604

2001-06-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010604

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-05-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010506

2001-05-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-05-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-05-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010505

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000519

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143857 T3

2000-04-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000428

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000425

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000422

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000420

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-19 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20000419

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000418

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000418

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000418

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701093 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188448 T 20000115

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981112

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE