Global patent index - EP 0897410 A4

EP 0897410 A4 2000-07-12 - COPOLYMERS OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE AND HEXAFLUOROPROPYLENE HAVING REDUCED EXTRACTABLE CONTENT AND IMPROVED SOLUTION CLARITY

Title (en)

COPOLYMERS OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE AND HEXAFLUOROPROPYLENE HAVING REDUCED EXTRACTABLE CONTENT AND IMPROVED SOLUTION CLARITY

Title (de)

VINYLIDENFLUORID-HEXAFLUOROPROPYLEN-COPOLYMEREN MIT REDUZIERTEM GEHALT AN EXTRAKTIONSFÄHIGEN STOFFEN UND VERBESSERTER LÖSUNGSKLARHEIT

Title (fr)

COPOLYMERES DE FLUORURE DE VINYLIDENE ET D'HEXAFLUOROPROPYLENE PRESENTANT UNE TENEUR EN CONSTITUANTS EXTRACTIBLES REDUITE ET UNE TRANSPARENCE DE SOLUTION AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 0897410 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98908865 A

Priority

  • US 9804072 W
  • US 3834697 P
  • US 3101498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838242A1] New and novel copolymers of vinylidene fluoride and hexafluoropropylene containing up to about 24 % by weight hexafluoropropylene having improved solution clarity and fluidity, longer gel times and lower extractables than prior art vinylidene fluoride-hexafluoropropylene copolymers of comparable HFP content whose syntheses are disclosed in sufficient detail to duplicate, to novel compositions of matter and articles of manufacture containing such copolymers, processes for the preparation and use of the copolymers, of the compositions of matter containing such copolymers and of the articles of manufacture containing such copolymers are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 5/00; C08F 214/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 14/22 (2006.01); C08F 214/22 (2006.01); H01M 2/16 (2006.01); H01M 4/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 214/22 (2013.01); H01M 2/1653 (2013.01); H01M 4/621 (2013.01); H01M 2300/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838242 A1 19980903; CA 2251535 A1 19980903; CN 1217727 A 19990526; EP 0897410 A1 19990224; EP 0897410 A4 20000712; HU 9903750 A2 20000328; HU 9903750 A3 20000728; ID 20295 A 19981126; JP 2002513435 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040420

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08J 5/00 A, 7C 08F 214/22 B, 7C 08F 214/22 J, 7C 08F 214:28 J

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981117

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE