Global Patent Index - EP 0897447 B1

EP 0897447 B1 2000-08-23 - HINGE WITH ELASTIC RING RETURN SYSTEM

Title (en)

HINGE WITH ELASTIC RING RETURN SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHARNIER MIT RÜCKSTELLEINRICHTUNG DURCH ELASTISCHEN RING

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE A SYSTEME DE RAPPEL PAR ANNEAU ELASTIQUE

Publication

EP 0897447 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97923137 A

Priority

  • FR 9700798 W
  • FR 9605774 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743511A1] The invention features a hinge for coupling two panels (P1, P2), one of which at least opens rotatably about an axis (X) parallel to the planes of the said panels, comprising a mobile fixing element (1) on the opening panel, a fixing element on the other panel and linking means (3) between the fixing elements co-operating with elastic return means of the panel opening to at least a stable angular equilibrium position, characterised in that the said return means consist of a ring (4) located in a cavity (10) of the mobile fixing element (1) and capable of being elastically deformed by the pressing action of a cam (30) rotating about a central shaft (5) parallel to the planes of the panels, being carried by the linking means (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06; E05D 5/02; E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/12 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/292 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5383 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53848 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54025 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743511 A1 19971120; AT 195790 T 20000915; CA 2253450 A1 19971120; DE 69702901 D1 20000928; DE 69702901 T2 20010301; EP 0897447 A1 19990224; EP 0897447 B1 20000823; ES 2151269 T3 20001216; FR 2748515 A1 19971114; FR 2748515 B1 19990820; JP 2000510205 A 20000808; US 6092263 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070506

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070506

2006-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. ADLER

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010506

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151269 T3

2000-11-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702901 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IT LU NL SE

2000-08-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195790 T 20000915

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980804

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IT LU NL SE