Global Patent Index - EP 0897454 B1

EP 0897454 B1 2001-02-28 - CLOSED LOOP FLUID-HANDLING SYSTEM FOR USE DURING DRILLING OF WELLBORES

Title (en)

CLOSED LOOP FLUID-HANDLING SYSTEM FOR USE DURING DRILLING OF WELLBORES

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR SPÜLUNGSAUFBEREITUNG IM GESCHLOSSENEN KREISLAUF ZUM EINSATZ IN BRUNNENBOHRUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MANUTENTION DE FLUIDES EN BOUCLE FERMEE UTILISE AU COURS DU FORAGE DE PUITS

Publication

EP 0897454 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97922650 A

Priority

  • US 9707533 W
  • US 64282896 A
  • US 3075296 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742395A1] This invention provides a fluid-handling system for use in underbalanced drilling operations. The system includes a first vessel which acts as a four phase separator. The first vessel includes a first stage for separating solids. Oil and gas are separated at a second stage. A pressure sensor provides signals to a pressure controller, which modulates a gas flow valve coupled to the vessel for discharging gas from the first vessel. The pressure controller maintains the pressure in the first vessel at a predetermined value. An oil level sensor placed in the first vessel provides a signal to an oil level controller. The oil level controller modulates an oil flow valve coupled to the vessel to discharge oil from the first vessel into a second vessel. Water is discharged into a third vessel. Water from the third vessel is discharged via a water flow control valve, which is modulated by a level controller as a function of the water level in the third vessel. Any gas in the third vessel is discharged by modulating a gas control valve as a function of the pressure in the third vessel. In an alternative embodiment, a central control unit or circuit is utilized to control the operations of all the flow valves. During operations, a control unit maintains the pressure and the levels of the fluids in such vessels at their respective predetermined values according to programmed instructions. The fluid-handling system also controls the wellbore pressure as a function of downhole-measured parameters and the drilling fluid mix as a function of selected operating parameters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/06; E21B 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2006.01); E21B 21/14 (2006.01); E21B 44/00 (2006.01); E21B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2013.01); E21B 21/14 (2013.01); E21B 44/00 (2013.01); E21B 2021/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742395 A1 19971113; AU 2826897 A 19971126; AU 723022 B2 20000817; CA 2252944 A1 19971113; CA 2252944 C 20060711; DE 69704158 D1 20010405; DE 69704158 T2 20010802; EP 0897454 A1 19990224; EP 0897454 B1 20010228; NO 315755 B1 20031020; NO 985098 A 19981230; NO 985098 D0 19981102

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170504

2017-05-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170504

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-05-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050505

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAKER HUGHES INC.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704158 20010405

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981028

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL