Global patent index - EP 0897465 B1

EP 0897465 B1 2000-02-09 - DIESEL ENGINE CONTROL

Title (en)

DIESEL ENGINE CONTROL

Title (de)

DIESELMOTORSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

REGULATION D'UN MOTEUR DIESEL

Publication

EP 0897465 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97920824 A

Priority

  • GB 9701216 W
  • GB 9609869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2312970A] A method of varying the quantity of fuel injected into the combustion chambers of a diesel engine during each combustion cycle in dependence upon the position of a demand pedal and the load on the engine, in which at least for demand pedal depressions not exceeding a preset limit the fuel is varied within an idling operating range as a first function of load to regulate the engine speed 44 at a substantially constant idling speed value and within a part load operating range as a second function of load 40 to allow the engine speed to reduce gradually with increased engine load, the idling speed value regulated within the idling operation range being itself dependent upon the position of the demand pedal. The method may involve determining the quantity of fuel required to maintain the engine idling at a speed dependent on accelerator pedal position, determining 40 the quantity of fuel required to allow the engine speed to vary with load in accordance with engine speed and accelerator depression via a speed droop controller, and supplying the engine with the higher of the two quantities 42.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

GB 2312970 A 19971112; GB 9609869 D0 19960717; DE 69701285 D1 20000316; DE 69701285 T2 20001026; EP 0897465 A1 19990224; EP 0897465 B1 20000209; ES 2142160 T3 20000401; WO 9743534 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69701285

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DOERFLER, THOMAS, DR.-ING., DE

2006-01-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-01-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2000-06-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142160

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701285

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981112

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB