Global Patent Index - EP 0897477 A4

EP 0897477 A4 2001-05-16 - ELECTROMAGNETICALLY SUSPENDED AND ROTATED CENTRIFUGAL PUMPING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETICALLY SUSPENDED AND ROTATED CENTRIFUGAL PUMPING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCH GELAGERTE UND ANGETRIEBENE KREISELPUMPE SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE POMPAGE ROTATIF HYBRIDE COMBINANT SUSTENTATION MAGNETIQUE ET FORCE CENTRIFUGE, ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0897477 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97923548 A

Priority

  • US 9707567 W
  • US 1685796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742414A1] An apparatus and method for a centrifugal pump (10) for pumping sensitive biological fluid which includes (i) an integral impeller and rotor (21) which is entirely supported and rotated magnetically by electromagnets (52, 54), (ii) a pump housing and arcuate passages (32, 34, 36) for fluid flow and containment, (iii) a brushless driving motor (40) embedded and integral with the pump housing, (iv) a power supply, and (v) specific electronic sensing and control algorithms -- all fitly jointed together to provide efficient, durable and low maintenance pump operation. A specially designed impeller and pump housing provide the mechanism for transport and delivery of fluid through the pump to a pump output port with reduced fluid turbulence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/06; F03B 13/00; F04B 17/00; F04B 35/04; F04D 7/00; F04D 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/10 (2006.01); F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/048 (2013.01); A61M 1/1015 (2013.01); A61M 1/1036 (2013.01); F04D 13/0646 (2013.01); F16C 32/0448 (2013.01); A61M 1/101 (2013.01); A61M 1/1017 (2013.01); A61M 1/1031 (2013.01); A61M 1/1086 (2013.01); A61M 1/122 (2013.01); A61M 2205/3334 (2013.01); F05B 2240/515 (2013.01); F16C 2316/18 (2013.01); F16C 2360/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9742414A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742414 A1 19971113; AU 2932497 A 19971126; AU 722998 B2 20000817; BR 9709305 A 19990810; CA 2253666 A1 19971113; CN 1228140 A 19990908; EP 0897477 A1 19990224; EP 0897477 A4 20010516; JP 2000510929 A 20000822; KR 20000010736 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF UTAH RESEARCH FOUNDATION

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDQUEST PRODUCTS, INC.

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA PATENT FOUNDATION

2001-05-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/06 A, 7F 04B 17/00 B, 7F 04B 35/04 B, 7F 03B 13/00 B, 7F 04D 7/00 B, 7F 04D 29/04 B

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981121

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE