Global Patent Index - EP 0897570 A4

EP 0897570 A4 2000-12-27 - MOISTURE DETECTING DEVICES SUCH AS FOR DIAPERS AND DIAPERS HAVING SUCH DEVICES

Title (en)

MOISTURE DETECTING DEVICES SUCH AS FOR DIAPERS AND DIAPERS HAVING SUCH DEVICES

Title (de)

FEUCHTIGKEITSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEISPIEL FÜR WINDELN UND WINDELN DAMIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS DE DETECTION D'HUMIDITE, PAR EXEMPLE POUR COUCHES, ET COUCHES COMPORTANT LESDITS DISPOSITIFS

Publication

EP 0897570 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97925622 A

Priority

  • US 9708405 W
  • US 64645396 A
  • US 66519996 A
  • US 66368696 A
  • US 70001196 A
  • US 77334396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742613A2] A pair of spaced electrodes within an area subject to wetness couple non-conductively with a sensor protected from wetness, and an alarm sounds in response to moisture decreasing the resistance between the electrodes. For example the electrodes project into the absorbent material of a diaper and extend along the inside of the diaper sheath opposite a pouch on the outside of the sheath. The pouch contains a sensor capacitively coupled to the electrodes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/22; G01N 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/00 (2006.01); A61F 5/44 (2006.01); A61F 13/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742613 A2 19971113; WO 9742613 A3 19980409; AU 3070597 A 19971126; BR 9711092 A 20000111; CA 2288646 A1 19971113; CN 1083331 C 20020424; CN 1226855 A 19990825; CN 1380547 A 20021120; EP 0897570 A2 19990224; EP 0897570 A4 20001227; JP 2002515975 A 20020528; NZ 333211 A 20001027

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 32B 31/00 A, 7G 01N 5/02 B, 7A 61F 13/15 B, 7A 61F 5/48 B, 7G 08B 21/00 B

2000-12-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 27/22 A, 7G 01N 27/12 B

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE