Global Patent Index - EP 0897584 B1

EP 0897584 B1 2000-03-22 - ROCKER SWITCH, PARTICULARLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFT

Title (en)

ROCKER SWITCH, PARTICULARLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFT

Title (de)

KIPPSCHALTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR FENSTERHEBER IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR A BASCULE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE LEVE-GLACE D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0897584 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925834 A

Priority

  • DE 9700909 W
  • DE 19619124 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19619124A1] A rocker switch (1), in particular a window lift switch for a motor vehicle comprises a switch housing (2) in which a sprung rocking lever (12) is fitted having at least one end position and one dead centre position. The rocking lever (12) is fitted with at least one switch arm (25) which operates at least one switch element (20). The rocking lever (12) is provided with a central lug in which a sprung detent element (18) is inserted which interacts with a detent curve (9) depending on the position of the rocking lever (12). To reduce the size of the switch housing (2) and to compensate for fitting tolerances the switch housing (2) is provided with a integral locating part (5) in which the rocking lever (12) is carried and the detent curve (9) integrated, with the locating part (5) enclosing at least one switch element (20) and one switch arm (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/02; H01H 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/04 (2006.01); H01H 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/145 (2013.01); H01H 23/04 (2013.01); E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/854 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/86 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01); H01H 2300/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19619124 A1 19971113; DE 19619124 B4 20040226; BR 9708985 A 19990803; EP 0897584 A1 19990224; EP 0897584 B1 20000322; ES 2145606 T3 20000701; WO 9743777 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701318

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701318

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701318

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110429

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-12-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-07-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145606 T3

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701318 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT