Global patent index - EP 0897681 A3

EP 0897681 A3 2001-01-31 - Mounting for attachment of a door to a corner cupboard carrousel

Title (en)

Mounting for attachment of a door to a corner cupboard carrousel

Title (de)

Beschlag zur Befestigung einer Tür an einem Eckschrankkarussell

Title (fr)

Pièce de montage pour la fixation d'une porte à un placard de coin comportant un carrousel

Publication

EP 0897681 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109691 A

Priority

DE 29714738 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897681A2] The ferrule plate comprises a plate part (12) and at least one door strip (14) which is adjustably attached to the plate part and onto which a door (10) is mounted. The door is detachably mounted to the door strip by holders (18) and associated locking bars (16). The holders and the strips are held in a defined position relative to each other through centring cams (40) that mate with counter-profiles (42) and the space between them is adjusted by the locking bars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29714738 U1 19990107; EP 0897681 A2 19990224; EP 0897681 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-11-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020516

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI