Global Patent Index - EP 0897743 A3

EP 0897743 A3 2001-02-07 - Mixing apparatus for lacquers

Title (en)

Mixing apparatus for lacquers

Title (de)

Mischvorrichtung für Lacke

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mélange pour laques

Publication

EP 0897743 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113639 A

Priority

DE 19735535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897743A2] Mixing equipment for paint components, especially a hardener and base paint of a two part water-based paint includes an ultrasonic emitter and the components to be mixed are either located within the area covered by the emitter or they flow past this area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/02 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/0258 (2013.01); B01F 13/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897743 A2 19990224; EP 0897743 A3 20010207; DE 19735535 A1 19990225; DE 19735535 C2 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980811

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI