Global Patent Index - EP 0897804 A3

EP 0897804 A3 2000-05-03 - Liquid ink printhead

Title (en)

Liquid ink printhead

Title (de)

Flüssige Tinte verwendender Druckkopf

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression par encre liquide

Publication

EP 0897804 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303777 A

Priority

US 91124297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897804A2] A liquid ink printer including a liquid ink printhead for ejecting liquid ink drops on a recording medium to form an image thereon having reduced misting defects. A printhead includes a selection circuit (100), coupled to a plurality of transducers (92), for causing non-adjacent nozzles of an array of nozzles (50) to eject liquid ink drops substantially simultaneously. In addition, a method of reducing misting defects during printing of a line of an image by a liquid ink printhead having a plurality of transducers (92) being activatable to eject ink from an array of N nozzles (50) includes the steps of ejecting a first ink drop from a first nozzle and a second ink drop from a second nozzle substantially simultaneously to form a first portion of the line of the image, the first nozzle and the second nozzle being non-adjacent, and ejecting a third ink drop from a third nozzle of the array of nozzles to form a second portion of the line of the image, the third nozzle being located between the first nozzle and the second nozzle. Multiple ripples of the printhead nozzles are made to complete a single line of the image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/21; B41J 2/045; B41J 2/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01); B41J 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/04541 (2013.01); B41J 2/04543 (2013.01); B41J 2/0458 (2013.01); B41J 2/2132 (2013.01); B41J 19/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897804 A2 19990224; EP 0897804 A3 20000503; JP H11105289 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020205

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/21 A, 7B 41J 2/05 B, 7B 41J 2/045 B

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI