Global Patent Index - EP 0897847 B1

EP 0897847 B1 2003-06-25 - Method of controlling a track mounted brake

Title (en)

Method of controlling a track mounted brake

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern einer Gleisbremse

Title (fr)

Procédé pour commander un frein de voie

Publication

EP 0897847 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250295 A

Priority

DE 19736709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736709C1] The method involves controlling a rail brake (GB) with several (k) individual brakes (1-4) for braking individual courses each with several running mechanisms (LW1). The run in speed of each mechanism (LW1) in the brake (GB) is determined. A target run-out speed of each mechanism is provided from the brake (GB). An excess energy in braking is determined from the energy difference between the run-in speed and the target run-out speed. Each individual brake (1-4) is controlled in either of the discrete switched on or released operating states. During running, the axles of a rotating mechanism (LW1) are impacted simultaneously by one of the individual brakes. The required number of individual brakes to be switched on is determined according to a discrete algorithm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FI IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736709 C1 19981126; AT 243636 T 20030715; EP 0897847 A1 19990224; EP 0897847 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FI IT LI SE

2003-06-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, MARTIN

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TALKE, WOLFGANG, DR.

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOLTZ, REINHOLD

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECKMANN, JOHANNES

1999-12-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH FI IT LI SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FI IT LI SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI