Global Patent Index - EP 0897884 B1

EP 0897884 B1 2002-09-04 - Lifting drive for an automatic pile changing device

Title (en)

Lifting drive for an automatic pile changing device

Title (de)

Hubantrieb für eine automatische Stapelwechselvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Commande de levage pour un dispositif automatique de changement de pile

Publication

EP 0897884 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113067 A

Priority

DE 19735895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735895C1] The drive has a stack carrying plate and an auxiliary stack carrying device which can be raised and lowered by drives (7,11) and drive controllers (12,13). The drive controllers interact with signals from a controller (14) which evaluates a stack height sensor (15) signal. Switching signals of equal duration are defined for the drive controllers by the controller for synchronous movement of the stack carrying plate (6) and the auxiliary carrying device (3). One drive controller has a characteristic designed so that the same displacement is achieved as for the load of the other drive during a switching signal from the load associated with its drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/26 (2006.01); B65H 1/30 (2006.01); B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 1/14 (2013.01); B65H 2403/00 (2013.01); B65H 2513/104 (2013.01); B65H 2557/31 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2513/104 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735895 C1 19980910; AT 223344 T 20020915; EP 0897884 A1 19990224; EP 0897884 B1 20020904; JP H11116076 A 19990427; US 6142463 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805386

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59805386

- Effective date: 20120510

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090714

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805386 20021010

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223344 T 20020915

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981223

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI