Global Patent Index - EP 0897893 A3

EP 0897893 A3 2000-02-23 - Tractor pipelaying unit

Title (en)

Tractor pipelaying unit

Title (de)

Rohrverlegungseinheit für Traktor

Title (fr)

Unité de pose de tuyaux pour tracteur

Publication

EP 0897893 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306735 A

Priority

US 5620197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897893A2] Improvements are made to prior tractors supported and driven by a rubber track (62) having bogie wheels (61) to increase the boom lifting capacity. The improvements include a main subframe having a loop-like structure which has a center section (74) extending under the tractor frame (70,72) midway between the front idler wheels (63) and rear drive wheels (65), two end sections (76,80) extending outwardly, one end section (76) supporting the drawworks (78) and the other end (80) supporting the tairlead (82). A rigid cross member extends from the fairlead (82) to the drawworks (78) and is positioned above the tractor frame (70,72) beneath the cab (106). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/62; B66C 23/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/44 (2006.01); B66C 23/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/62 (2013.01); B66C 23/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0897893 A2 19990224; EP 0897893 A3 20000223; AU 8078598 A 19990304; CA 2245392 A1 19990221

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-05-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE DK FI GB IT LI LU NL

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990823

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI GB IT LI NL

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI