Global Patent Index - EP 0897998 B1

EP 0897998 B1 2001-12-05 - Reductive nickel bath

Title (en)

Reductive nickel bath

Title (de)

Reduktives Ni-Bad

Title (fr)

Bain de nickel reducteur

Publication

EP 0897998 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114391 A

Priority

DE 19733991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0897998A2] An aqueous acid, reductive deposition bath (I) for the electroless deposition of nickel, comprises (per litre of bath liquid):(A) 3-10 g nickel in the form of a nickel salt (B) 5-45 g of a hypophosphite as reducing agent (C) 0.4-1 mole of a carboxylic acid and/or hydroxycarboxylic acid including di- and tri-carboxylic acids as a complexant for nickel, (D) 0.5-3 mg lead, tin, arsenic, thallium or molybdenum acetate or sulphate as stabiliser and (E) thiourea, isothiourea or a thiocyanate as an accelerator containing nitrogen, sulphur, alkyl or aryl substituents, present at a molar concentration 1-3 times that of (D).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733991 A1 19990211; AT 210207 T 20011215; EP 0897998 A2 19990224; EP 0897998 A3 19990512; EP 0897998 B1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802304 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210207 T 20011215

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI