Global Patent Index - EP 0898010 A3

EP 0898010 A3 2000-10-11 - Use of active coal and/or carbon molecular sieves for improving the fogging behaviour of fabrics, leather and fibre reinforced composites

Title (en)

Use of active coal and/or carbon molecular sieves for improving the fogging behaviour of fabrics, leather and fibre reinforced composites

Title (de)

Verwendung von Aktivkohle und/oder Kohlenstoffmolekularsieben zur Verbesserung des Fogging-Verhaltens von Geweben, Ledern und Faserverbundwerkstoffen

Title (fr)

Utilisation de charbon actif et/ou de tamis moléculaires au carbone pour diminuer les émissions de buée de tissus, du cuir et des composites renforcés par des fibres

Publication

EP 0898010 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115547 A

Priority

DE 19735960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898010A2] The active carbon (AC) and/or carbon molecular sieves (CMS) contains polymeric binder(s) based on aqueous polymer dispersions made from unsaturated monomers is claimed. Also claimed is a method for improving the fogging properties of these materials by adding AC and/or CMS to the aqueous dispersion of emulsion polymer (above).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 11/74; C14C 9/00; D06M 15/21; D06N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 9/00 (2006.01); D06M 11/74 (2006.01); D06M 15/21 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 9/00 (2013.01); D06M 11/74 (2013.01); D06M 15/21 (2013.01); D06N 3/0063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898010 A2 19990224; EP 0898010 A3 20001011; DE 19735960 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06M 11/74 A, 7D 06N 3/00 B, 7C 14C 9/00 B, 7D 06M 15/21 B

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORRISON, BRADLEY RONALD, DR.

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OFFNER, ROLAND FRANCOIS EUGENE

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, ULRICH, DR.

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUMMERICH, RAINER, DR.

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT-THUEMMES, JUERGEN, DR.

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI