Global Patent Index - EP 0898033 B1

EP 0898033 B1 2003-06-11 - Transport- and storage facility, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Transport- and storage facility, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Transport- und Lagereinrichtung, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Ensemble de transport et de stockage, notamment pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0898033 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115588 A

Priority

DE 29715008 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898033A1] The storage facility has towers of storage or parking spaces arranged around a central lift shaft. The lift (5) has a platform (7) which can swivel about a vertical axis and be extended and retracted horizontally, so that palleted loads, e.g. vehicles or containers, can be delivered to and retrieved from the storage spaces. The lift is operated by four hydraulic rams (10) with travel indicators, ropes and pulleys. The lift controls ensure that the loaded platform tilts so that its outer edge is some 5 cm higher than the inner edge, and the tilt angle reduces as the platform is extended into the storage space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/22; B65G 1/04; E04H 6/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/22 (2006.01); E04H 6/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/282 (2013.01); E04H 6/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715008 U1 19971002; EP 0898033 A1 19990224; EP 0898033 B1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808675 P 20030717

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI