Global Patent Index - EP 0898036 A3

EP 0898036 A3 2000-04-19 - Bar-hinge fitting for doors

Title (en)

Bar-hinge fitting for doors

Title (de)

Stangen-Türband-Garnitur

Title (fr)

Garniture de barre-penture pour porte

Publication

EP 0898036 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115892 A

Priority

DE 29715007 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898036A2] A door hinge fitting for left- and right handed doors, comprises a wing section (2) and a frame section (5), as well as a bar (1) on which the wing can be fixed. A locating surface (10a, 10b) is located on the bar for each wing section, and the surface has ribs (110) and/or depressions (111) which run laterally. The wing (2) can be adjusted using the surfaces. The frame(s) preferably has a box section (4) made of a plastic e.g. polyamide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04; E05D 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05D 5/127 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 2003/027 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715007 U1 19971016; EP 0898036 A2 19990224; EP 0898036 A3 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI