Global Patent Index - EP 0898041 A3

EP 0898041 A3 2000-12-27 - Device for watertight obturation of openings

Title (en)

Device for watertight obturation of openings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum wasserdichten Verschliessen von Öffnungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour obturer étanchement à l'eau d'ouvertures

Publication

EP 0898041 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115066 A

Priority

DE 19735773 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898041A2] The deformable body (5) has a filled cross-sectional surface equal to or greater than the cross-sectional surface of the aperture to be closed. It takes the form of a cushion or bag which is the filled state locates tightly against the inner edge or inner surface of the aperture. On its inside it has an air and water-tight elastic material. The outer surface of the device comprises a very strong and/or rip-proof fabric. The central part of the cross-sectional surface of the device is formed by an elastically non-deformable, water-impermeable material, i.e. a plate of plastic or metal and has a body running around completely or partly its outer edge comprising an elastically deformable material. A valve (6) is provided in the device (5) or the elastically deformable body for inlet and/or outlet of filling medium. The device can comprise a multi-chamber body with the individual chambers provided with valves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/00 (2013.01); E06B 7/2318 (2013.01); E06B 2009/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898041 A2 19990224; EP 0898041 A3 20001227; DE 19735773 A1 19990225; DE 19735773 B4 20050310

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI