Global Patent Index - EP 0898042 A3

EP 0898042 A3 2000-06-14 - Roller shutter box

Title (en)

Roller shutter box

Title (de)

Rolladenkasten

Title (fr)

Carter de volet à rouleau

Publication

EP 0898042 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111810 A

Priority

DE 19735997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898042A2] The heating device (22) is formed as a heating cable, heating band or heating bar and is fixed to the inner wall of the roller blond box (10). It is electrically heated and an operating switch is provided for switching it on and off. A temperature measurement device switches the heating device on when the temperature is below a specific level. A temperature regulating device sets a temperature slightly above freezing point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898042 A2 19990224; EP 0898042 A3 20000614; DE 19735997 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI