Global Patent Index - EP 0898056 B1

EP 0898056 B1 2002-11-27 - Seal for machine parts reciprocating relatively to one another

Title (en)

Seal for machine parts reciprocating relatively to one another

Title (de)

Abdichtung für relativ zueinander hin- und hergehende Maschinenteile

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité pour pièces de machine ayant un mouvement de va-et-vient l'une par rapport à l'autre

Publication

EP 0898056 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115062 A

Priority

DE 19736321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898056A2] The seal consists of an shell-shaped holding part (5) holding the elastomer sealing lip (1), held under radial spring pressure against one of the machine parts. It projects axially above the sealing lip and serves to fix the seal to the second part (3). In its projecting sector (6), the holding part has at least one inward-angled projection (8) which engages in a recess (9) in the surface of the second part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/08 (2013.01); Y10S 277/909 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898056 A2 19990224; EP 0898056 A3 19990324; EP 0898056 B1 20021127; DE 19736321 A1 19990311; US 6227548 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070811

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070811

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070811

2006-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061002

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806411 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI