Global Patent Index - EP 0898059 A3

EP 0898059 A3 2000-03-15 - Decompression valve engine brake

Title (en)

Decompression valve engine brake

Title (de)

Dekompressionsventil-Motorbremse

Title (fr)

Frein moteur à soupape de décompression

Publication

EP 0898059 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114353 A

Priority

DE 19735822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735822C1] The engine has a control device including at least one pressure-creating element, at least one pressure limiting element, and also control and regulating elements. Of the valves in the cylinder head, at least one can be connected to the control device and operated by control pressure. With the valve open, a connection is provided between a combustion chamber and the exhaust gas system. This valve (9), when open, is also able to link the combustion chamber (12) to a compressed air system (13) via a connecting line (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/06; F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/06 (2006.01); F02B 21/00 (2006.01); F02D 9/06 (2006.01); F02D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/06 (2013.01); F02B 21/00 (2013.01); F02D 9/06 (2013.01); F02D 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735822 C1 19981001; EP 0898059 A2 19990224; EP 0898059 A3 20000315; US 6050239 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020919

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020415

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000212

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI