Global Patent Index - EP 0898066 A3

EP 0898066 A3 2000-05-31 - Method of controlling an air-fuel ratio of an engine

Title (en)

Method of controlling an air-fuel ratio of an engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung des Luft-Kraftstoffverhältnisses in einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande du rapport air-carburant d'un moteur à combusion

Publication

EP 0898066 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98113470 A

Priority

JP 19612397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898066A2] The elapsed time Ta(i) of a 30 DEG crank angle near top dead center of compression and the elapsed time Tb(i) of a 30 DEG crank angle near 90 DEG after top dead center of compression are found. The difference DTa(i) of the elapsed times Ta(i) between 720 DEG crank angle for a first cylinder and a second cylinder performing combustion after the first cylinder is found. The assumed elapsed time when assuming that there is no torque fluctuation is calculated from the difference DTa(i) of the elapsed time of the first cylinder and the elapsed time of the second cylinder is calculated and the assumed elapsed time is used to calculate the basic amount of torque fluctuation. A set value is found based on the engine speed. The set value represents a deviation of the basic amount of torque fluctuation due to the detection error of the elapsed time, and due to the torsional vibration of the engine drive system and the torsional vibration of the crankshaft. The set value is subtracted from the basic amount of torque fluctuation to calculate the amount of torque fluctuation. The air-fuel ratio is controlled based on the amount of torque fluctuation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 41/1475 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898066 A2 19990224; EP 0898066 A3 20000531; EP 0898066 B1 20030910; DE 69817952 D1 20031016; DE 69817952 T2 20040715; JP 3216577 B2 20011009; JP H1136951 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69817952

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100720

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-15 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20061025

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817952 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI