Global patent index - EP 0898085 A3

EP 0898085 A3 2000-01-19 - Pressurised-fluid motor for electrorheological fluids

Title (en)

Pressurised-fluid motor for electrorheological fluids

Title (de)

Druckmittelmotor für elektrorheologische Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Vérin à fluide à pression pour fluides électrorhéologiques

Publication

EP 0898085 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114617 A

Priority

DE 19735466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898085A2] The motor has a piston movable in a housing (1) with two working chambers, an inlet channel for the liquid from a higher pressure chamber, an outlet channel to a lower pressure chamber and electrorheological valves (1a,1b) with annular gaps (8) connecting the channels and chambers with electrodes for generating an electric field. The valves are formed by longitudinal bores (6) through the housing wall containing insulated elements (7) bounding annular gaps of constant width. The elements and housing are connected to high voltage and earth respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/20 (2006.01); F15B 21/06 (2006.01); H02N 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735466 A1 19990218; DE 19735466 B4 20070628; DE 59813531 D1 20060614; EP 0898085 A2 19990224; EP 0898085 A3 20000119; EP 0898085 B1 20060510; JP H11125215 A 19990511; US 6116144 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59813531

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130804

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FLUDICON G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59813531

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20060614

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADAMS, DOROTHEA

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUESING, KLAUS

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEES, GERALD

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSENFELDT, HORST DR.

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHERK, HORST

2006-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WENDT, ECKHARDT DR.

2006-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLUDICON GMBH

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL SCHENCK AG

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADAMS, DOROTHEA

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUESING, KLAUS

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FEES, GERALD

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSENFELDT, HORST DR.

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHERK, HORST

1999-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WENDT, ECKHARDT DR.

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI