Global Patent Index - EP 0898116 B1

EP 0898116 B1 2002-11-06 - Heat exchange device for a circulating fluidized bed boiler

Title (en)

Heat exchange device for a circulating fluidized bed boiler

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wärmeaustausch für einen Kessel mit zirkulierendem Wirbelbett

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'échange thermique pour une chaudière à lit fluidisé circulant

Publication

EP 0898116 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402064 A

Priority

FR 9710426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898116A1] The heat exchanger system is used with a heater with a circulating fluidised bed. Fluid flows in through a first heat exchanger (ET1) which is followed by a second heat exchanger (ET2). The fluid approaching the first heat exchanger is split into four streams, one of which enters the heat exchanger and three of which bypass the first heat exchanger and go to the second heat exchanger. The output from the first heat exchanger is divided into three, with each branch joining one of the bypass branches. The three united flows go to separate headers (A1-3) for separate tube bundles (F1-3) inside the second heat exchanger. All the tube bundles discharge into a common header (BS) leading to a common outlet. The fluidised particulate material enters the heat-exchanger through a first conduit (2E), flows past the tube bundles and leaves via a second, diametrically-opposed conduit, (2S).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 31/00; F28D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/02 (2006.01); F22B 31/00 (2006.01); F28D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 13/00 (2013.01); F22B 31/0084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898116 A1 19990224; EP 0898116 B1 20021106; DE 69809156 D1 20021212; DE 69809156 T2 20030717; DK 0898116 T3 20030310; ES 2183302 T3 20030316; FR 2767380 A1 19990219; FR 2767380 B1 19990924; JP H11182801 A 19990706; PL 328052 A1 19990301; US 6206088 B1 20010327; ZA 9807424 B 19990222

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 69809156

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER SYSTEMS SA, LAVALLOIS PERRET CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, MEUDON LA FORET, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLA, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER SYSTEMS SA, LAVALLOIS PERRET CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, MEUDON LA FORET, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLA, FR

- Document: DE 69809156

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809156

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090803

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030814

2004-04-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183302 T3

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809156 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FI GB

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI GB

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI