Global Patent Index - EP 0898142 A3

EP 0898142 A3 2000-04-12 - Repeating rifle having an axially sliding repeating unit

Title (en)

Repeating rifle having an axially sliding repeating unit

Title (de)

Repetiergewehr mit einer axial geführten Repetiereinheit

Title (fr)

Fusil à répétition comportant une unité de répétition à coulissement axial

Publication

EP 0898142 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115453 A

Priority

DE 19735737 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898142A2] The operating device is formed as an axially movable pistol grip (2) with a statistically located trigger cock (5) framed by a trigger stirrup (6). It is connected with the closure (1) by two L-shaped strips (3) which slide on both sides of the axis of the barrel in grooves and with their shorter ends are anchored to the closure. The L-shaped strips (3) with their longer ends are anchored to the pistol grip and the trigger stirrup. The securing device incorporates a spring-loaded trigger (7) fitted on the rear-side extension of the pistol grip, via which the repeater unit is locked in the closed position of the closure and in the operated state of the trigger the trigger cock (5) is released.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/32; F41A 3/72; F41A 17/76; F41C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898142 A2 19990224; EP 0898142 A3 20000412; EP 0898142 B1 20020731; AT 221641 T 20020815; DE 19735737 A1 19990304; DE 19735737 C2 19991202; US 5992075 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804974

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804974 20020905

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOMMER, GERD

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221641 T 20020815

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011010

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 17/32 A, 7F 41A 3/72 B, 7F 41C 7/04 B, 7F 41A 17/76 B

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI