Global Patent Index - EP 0898207 A3

EP 0898207 A3 2000-03-22 - Photosensitive body and electrophotographic printer using the same

Title (en)

Photosensitive body and electrophotographic printer using the same

Title (de)

Photoempfindliches Element und damit versehener elektrophotographischer Drucker

Title (fr)

Elément photosensible et imprimante électrophotographique l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0898207 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98115633 A

Priority

JP 22399997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898207A2] The present invention provides a photosensitive body and an electrophotographic printer capable of notifying an operating whether a protection film 15 is correctly peeled off from a photosensitive surface 1a of the photosensitive body. The protection film 15 has marks 15a and 15b to be automatically detected. The electrophotographic printer 100 comprises a peel member 13, a guide route for guiding the peeled off protection film out of the printer, a magnetic sensor 14 for detecting the marks 15a and 15b, and a control circuit 17 for deciding according to an output of the magnetic sensor whether the protection film is correctly peeled off and outputting the decision result through a liquid crystal display panel 19. This enables an operator to know about the peeling state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/75 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 301 (P - 1233) 31 July 1991 (1991-07-31)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 058 (P - 550) 21 February 1987 (1987-02-21)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 276 (P - 613) 8 September 1987 (1987-09-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 669 (M - 1725) 16 December 1994 (1994-12-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898207 A2 19990224; EP 0898207 A3 20000322; JP H1165398 A 19990305

INPADOC legal status


2000-05-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000403

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI